Trustees DUNDONALD PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA
Charity number: 1121689

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Deol | Chair | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Mary Price | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Kemsley | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kate Silverstein | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laurien Gloag | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tara Jayne Macsweeney | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Crowley | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Peck | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ili Afifuddin | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.