Financial history DERBY SKILLBUILD

Charity number: 1120952
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £240.64k £367.41k £352.49k £341.67k £399.60k
Total expenditure £285.50k £346.50k £367.78k £375.75k £432.70k
Income from government contracts £224.40k £234.77k £352.49k £339.64k £398.60k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A