Accounts and annual returns HOLY CROSS COMMUNITY CENTRE NORTH BERSTED

Charity number: 1119617
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 05 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 07 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 21 September 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 12 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required