Financial history HOLY CROSS COMMUNITY CENTRE NORTH BERSTED

Charity number: 1119617
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £25.10k £15.51k £14.93k £27.07k £13.85k
Total expenditure £13.23k £12.01k £13.98k £11.18k £8.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0