Accounts and annual returns THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF THE BOSCASTLE MUSEUM OF WITCHCRAFT

Charity number: 1120014
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required