Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF THE BOSCASTLE MUSEUM OF WITCHCRAFT

Charity number: 1120014
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.66k £6.08k £7.79k £7.51k £8.00k
Total expenditure £5.82k £5.09k £4.49k £7.46k £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A