Financial history CBK FOUNDATION FOR DEMOCRACY AND JUSTICE

Charity number: 1122395
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £9.23k £0 £12 £6 £6
Total expenditure £855 £0 £512 £30 £750
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A