Financial history SOMALI SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1120892
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £30.24k £41.08k £36.00k £37.71k £0
Total expenditure £22.43k £42.67k £40.85k £38.74k £12.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A