Accounts and annual returns CHAPELFIELD COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1123739
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 December 2014 06 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 28 December 2013 13 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 December 2013 13 May 2014 On Time
Annual return 28 December 2012 30 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 December 2012 30 April 2013 On Time
Annual return 28 December 2011 30 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 December 2011 30 April 2012 On Time