Financial history CHAPELFIELD COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1123739
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/12/2010 28/12/2011 28/12/2012 28/12/2013 28/12/2014
Total gross income £21.26k £31.04k £52.46k £41.63k £9.04k
Total expenditure £31.49k £30.92k £37.50k £35.61k £32.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A