Financial history MESH COMMUNITY COHESION SERVICES

Charity number: 1121249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £93.63k £137.16k £79.40k £40.60k £49.25k
Total expenditure £80.63k £134.59k £55.74k £52.25k £49.67k
Income from government contracts £13.90k £133.03k £15.38k £2.50k £28.79k
Income from government grants £13.90k £2.00k £29.16k £2.50k N/A