Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CWMCARN HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1123741
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 February 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 21 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 06 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required