Financial history FRIENDS OF CWMCARN HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1123741
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £2.83k £1.10k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £916 £20 £0 £2.30k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0