Financial history WILLIAM J. CLINTON FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1123171
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £0 £3.00k £27.66k £0 £9.92k
Total expenditure £111.85k £8.56k £131.87k £4.85k £6.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A