Accounts and annual returns UKR - AID

Charity number: 1122375
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 March 2017 25 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2016 27 February 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2015 04 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2015 Not Required