Financial history UKR - AID

Charity number: 1122375
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2013 30/03/2014 30/03/2015 30/03/2016 30/03/2017
Total gross income £1.62k £643 £695 £1.08k £1.13k
Total expenditure £1.07k £73 £73 £73 £573
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A