Accounts and annual returns LOOK EAST WILD EARTH

Charity number: 1123541
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 October 2015 05 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 October 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 05 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 29 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 20 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 20 December 2013 On Time