Financial history LOOK EAST WILD EARTH

Charity number: 1123541
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 02/10/2015
Total gross income £19.84k £7.71k £1.33k £438 £0
Total expenditure £13.68k £10.09k £3.67k £668 £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A