Accounts and annual returns CHASE CROSS BAPTIST CHURCH PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1123912
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 26 July 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 26 July 2017 26 days late
Annual return 31 August 2015 04 July 2016 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 04 July 2016 4 days late
Annual return 31 August 2014 10 November 2015 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 11 November 2015 134 days late