Financial history CHASE CROSS BAPTIST CHURCH PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1123912
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £70.60k £74.65k £66.02k £40.73k £43.35k
Total expenditure £68.18k £60.80k £52.91k £53.45k £50.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £27.97k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £3.32k