Financial history SALFORD DISABILITY FORUM

Charity Number: 1125859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.82k £800 £21.60k £6.55k £46.19k
Total expenditure £13.16k £2.01k £5.37k £13.11k £16.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £21.60k N/A £15.75k