Trustees SALFORD DISABILITY FORUM

Charity Number: 1125859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Bryan Bridge Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Janet Taylor Trustee 26 January 2023
None on record
Carol Babbs Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
KAY FAIRHURST Trustee 19 May 2015
None on record
Joyce Beard Trustee 18 November 2002
None on record