Financial history YOUNG SINGERS WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1125420
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £16.14k £21.85k £14.63k £10.24k £7.50k
Total expenditure £9.53k £8.12k £9.02k £6.88k £9
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A