Financial history AMSER JUSTIN TIME - ELUSEN CANCR PANCREAS CYMRU/PANCREATIC CANCER CHARITY WALES

Charity Number: 1124951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £82.42k £5.60k £2.76k £15.49k £2.54k
Total expenditure £5.35k £28.33k £29.06k £34.82k £15.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A