Financial history THE HAMPSTEAD VILLAGE SHUL

Charity number: 1124605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £541.24k £525.33k £517.86k £537.83k £635.04k
Total expenditure £349.31k £450.52k £438.32k £515.40k £624.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.31k £60.14k £39.56k £5.14k £6.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £489.76k £478.22k £465.61k £496.86k £612.30k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £51.48k £47.12k £49.25k £40.97k £22.74k
Income - Other £0 £0 £3.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £349.31k £450.52k £438.32k £515.40k £624.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.36k £3.63k £3.69k £28.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0