Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ALWOODLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1126314
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 March 2021 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required