Financial history FRIENDS OF ALWOODLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1126314
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £4.83k £10.72k £4.49k £5.21k £882
Total expenditure £3.85k £8.09k £11.04k £3.05k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A