Financial history BREATHTAKERS OB TRUST

Charity number: 1125330
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2011 31/10/2012 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015
Total gross income £28.33k £43.54k £52.34k £59.45k £42.57k
Total expenditure £18.59k £39.39k £56.58k £58.01k £44.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0