Financial history RIVERSIDE DAY NURSERY (READING) LTD

Charity Number: 1126904
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £320.71k £355.92k £369.82k £455.96k £423.48k
Total expenditure £319.32k £353.35k £373.24k £457.13k £407.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £162.23k £116.06k