Accounts and annual returns KIRKLEES FAITH FORUM

Charity number: 1127058
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2017 26 March 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 10 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2015 12 July 2016 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 12 July 2016 134 days late