Financial history KIRKLEES FAITH FORUM

Charity number: 1127058
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £78.05k £53.40k £53.40k £11.49k £2.68k
Total expenditure £64.67k £67.21k £13.81k £35.36k £295
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £6.10k N/A