Financial history EMPOWERING YOUTH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1127697
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 31/03/2020
Total gross income £76.24k £11.73k £0 £1 £8
Total expenditure £66.64k £34.54k £1.24k £0 £94
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A