Trustees 1ST MOUNTSORREL SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1128610

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Prisk | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROL LYNN BLACK | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bowler | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hatton | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Preston | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Osborn | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wood | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Holt | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Ward | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Sullivan | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
duncan stanley | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison MAckie | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
KARL MICHAEL WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.