Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY CAFES

Charity number: 1133152
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 05 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 05 April 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 26 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 26 July 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2012 10 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 12 September 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 16 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required