Financial history COMMUNITY CAFES

Charity number: 1133152
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £22.54k £20.24k £29.03k £29.03k £30.12k
Total expenditure £19.80k £14.72k £16.15k £22.31k £24.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A