Accounts and annual returns ST PHILOMENA TRUST

Charity number: 1134090
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 12 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2014 24 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2013 22 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2012 24 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not Required