Financial history ST PHILOMENA TRUST

Charity number: 1134090
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2011 31/10/2012 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015
Total gross income £4.22k £5.74k £175 £400 £25
Total expenditure £3.88k £5.81k £2.70k £4.16k £4.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A