Accounts and annual returns ORPHANS OF GHANA

Charity number: 1135404
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 February 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 27 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 14 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required