Financial history BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH, BARRY

Charity number: 1134474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £138.02k £108.46k £134.53k £110.81k £130.44k
Total expenditure £154.82k £119.44k £114.92k £119.93k £141.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £200 N/A N/A N/A N/A