Trustees BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH, BARRY

Charity number: 1134474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pastor Matt Emerton Chair
BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH, BARRY
Recently registered
Paul GRAY Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
Andrew Green Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
Angela Gray Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
Daniel Lewis GIBSON Trustee 12 September 2021
None on record
Brian Mark McGregor Trustee 01 August 2019
BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH, BARRY
Recently registered
Saffia Rose Kathleen HURLEY Trustee 18 July 2018
BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH, BARRY
Recently registered
Peter McLEAN Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record
CLIVE CASSIDY Trustee 15 July 2013
MANSE FOR A MINISTER IN CONNECTION WITH BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH, BARRY
Received: On time