Financial history WHITE ROCKS WESTERN RIDING GROUP

Charity Number: 1136681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £3.79k £820 £3.90k £5.51k £1.52k
Total expenditure £2.95k £3.81k £3.17k £3.70k £1.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A