Accounts and annual returns TREASURED BY SILVERFISH JEWELLERY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1142774
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 13 December 2016 166 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required