Financial history TREASURED BY SILVERFISH JEWELLERY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1142774
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £1.00k £1.00k £2.05k £885 £185
Total expenditure £1.00k £1.00k £1.65k £1.13k £702
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A