Financial history CHRIST CHURCH LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1125990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £404.93k £312.82k £269.24k £287.65k £289.22k
Total expenditure £276.22k £282.86k £259.55k £260.74k £294.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.78k £215 N/A N/A