Accounts and annual returns THE ALDERLEY AND WILMSLOW MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1127394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 06 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 November 2024 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 January 2025 274 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 03 August 2023 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window