Financial history THE ALDERLEY AND WILMSLOW MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1127394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £43.90k £864 £19.17k £35.68k £23.42k
Total expenditure £43.80k £0 £18.42k £48.08k £21.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A £2.00k N/A