Financial history BATH CENTRAL UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1130339
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £186.11k £81.91k £79.83k £101.42k £18.93k
Total expenditure £143.94k £126.64k £105.66k £88.18k £61.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.28k £10.38k N/A N/A