Accounts and annual returns THE BETHABARA BAPTIST CHAPEL FUND

Charity number: 500460
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 June 2023 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 March 2022 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 March 2022 496 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required