Financial history THE BETHABARA BAPTIST CHAPEL FUND

Charity number: 500460
Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £3.01k £1.55k £3.19k £2.39k £958
Total expenditure £3.68k £5.65k £3.68k £4.72k £3.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A