Accounts and annual returns HOLD IT DOWN LIMITED

Charity number: 1135191
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 27 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 31 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 15 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 September 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 03 April 2014 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 04 April 2014 63 days late